+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1540
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2905a
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.446
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (4)
June 6, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 5, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
March 21, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
March 21, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor