+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
- Amended 2903c
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.909
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2903b
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1773
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2903a
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (5)
June 1, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
May 17, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
March 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 9
June 17, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 17, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor