+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 29a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Budget And Revenue
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Budget And Revenue
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Budget And Revenue
+ − Vote
May 18, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Budget And Revenue)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor