+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a1052
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.31
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Corporations, Authorities and Commissions - Feb 4, 2013
- Yeas: 6
Details:
+
−
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
February 4, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Corporations, Authorities and Commissions - Feb 4, 2013
- Yeas: 6
Details:
+
−
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor