+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed chap.362
- Signed chap.362
On September 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to governor
- Delivered to governor
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Returned to senate
- Passed assembly
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.191
- Returned to senate
- Passed assembly
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.191
- Substituted for a4664b
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed senate
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to ways and means
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to assembly
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading cal.1246
- Committee discharged and committed to rules
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Print number 2856b
- Amend and recommit to finance
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Print number 2856a
- Amend (t) and recommit to education
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to education
+ − Votes (3)
June 12, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: - Jun 12, 2013
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Phil Boyle: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Patrick M. Gallivan: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Jeffrey D. Klein: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Bill Perkins: present
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: present
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- John L. Sampson: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- Jose M. Serrano: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Malcolm A. Smith: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
June 11, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Rules - Jun 11, 2013
- Yeas: 25
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
May 30, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Education - May 30, 2013
- Yeas: 18
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor