+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1232
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Vote
June 2, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor