+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To New York City Education
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Education
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2838b
- Amend And Recommit To New York City Education
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2838a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To New York City Education
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To New York City Education
+ − Vote
May 30, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate New York City Education)
- Yeas: 7