+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.218
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.389
- Substituted For A2229
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Mental Health
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1062
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor