+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.52
- Signed Chap.647
On November 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.378
- Substituted For A6772
- Referred To Labor
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.593
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
March 16, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor