+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.1067
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 2786a
- Amend and recommit to finance
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to health
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to rules
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading cal.1244
- Reported and committed to rules
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to health
+ − Votes (4)
June 2, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Finance - Jun 2, 2014
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 12
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: nay
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Ruben Diaz: nay
- Martin Malavé Dilan: nay
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Michael Gianaris: nay
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: nay
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Liz Krueger: nay
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: nay
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: nay
- José Peralta: nay
- Bill Perkins: nay
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: nay
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: nay
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
May 20, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Health - May 20, 2014
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 6
Details:
+
−
- Greg Ball: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: nay
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: nay
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Ted O'Brien: nay
- José Peralta: nay
- Gustavo Rivera: nay
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- Jose M. Serrano: nay
- James L. Seward: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
June 11, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Rules - Jun 11, 2013
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 9
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: nay
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: nay
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Michael Gianaris: nay
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: nay
- Liz Krueger: nay
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Tom Libous: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: nay
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: nay
- Bill Perkins: nay
- James L. Seward: yea
- Dean G. Skelos: yea
- Andrea Stewart-Cousins: nay
- David J. Valesky: yea
June 4, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Health - Jun 4, 2013
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: nay
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: nay
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Ted O'Brien: nay
- José Peralta: nay
- Gustavo Rivera: nay
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Catharine Young: yea