+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 2773a
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.494
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.514
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
July 21, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
February 25, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 15
May 15, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 4
April 30, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor