+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1449
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2767a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Education
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.2012
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
June 20, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 20, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63