+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1177
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.693
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
April 20, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor