+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A5151b
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 2724b
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
- Amended (t) 2724a
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.830
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Vote
May 9, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 19