+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.996
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Vote
May 16, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Consumer Protection)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor