+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A2693
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.101
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
+ − Vote
February 4, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Elections)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor