+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.584
On October 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.692
- Substituted For A4599a
On May 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On May 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On May 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On May 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 2683a
On February 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On February 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.347
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
February 13, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor