+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2680a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Insurance
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On June 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1181
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Vote
May 22, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 11