+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a587
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.416
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to veterans, homeland security and military affairs
+ − Votes (3)
April 23, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Finance - Apr 23, 2013
- Yeas: 36
Details:
+
−
- John J. Bonacic: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- John A. DeFrancisco: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Michael Gianaris: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Liz Krueger: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: yea
- Michael F. Nozzolio: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Bill Perkins: yea
- Michael H. Ranzenhofer: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
- John L. Sampson: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Daniel L. Squadron: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
April 16, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs - Apr 16, 2013
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- John L. Sampson: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: absent
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea
April 16, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs - Apr 16, 2013
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Terry Gipson: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- John L. Sampson: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: absent
- Lee M. Zeldin: yea