+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.257
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2661a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Vote
March 17, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor