+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommitted To Rules
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1222
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2652a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor