+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.921
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.238
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (4)
May 24, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
May 17, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
March 11, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor