+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2630a
- Amend And Recommit To Civil Service And Pensions
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.694
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Vote
May 18, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Civil Service And Pensions)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor