+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.153
On August 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.298
- Substituted For A5608
On February 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Social Services
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.109
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Social Services
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Social Services)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor