+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.824
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On January 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.82
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (3)
April 17, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 16
January 31, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
January 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor