+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1221
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.978
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (4)
June 15, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
May 28, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 5
May 27, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1