+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 13, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.515
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1227
On January 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2024: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 15
June 8, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor