+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2594a
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Votes (2)
January 29, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 13
February 14, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor