+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.320
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 2590a
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.425
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 6
April 27, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Labor)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor