+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.472
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.162
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
June 4, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
February 12, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2
February 6, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1