+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.622
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2572a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1309
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
June 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 14
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4