+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.126
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.340
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2
January 14, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 14, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 3
March 26, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor