+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2554a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1541
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (5)
January 22, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 19
June 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 3
June 12, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 8, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1