+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.186
On November 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.287
- Substituted For A4377a
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 2542a
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.645
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
June 20, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
April 25, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 17
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor