+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A1880a
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
- Amended (t) 2534a
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.986
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
May 3, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1