+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.659
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
April 20, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15