+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2527a
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
March 9, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor