+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On February 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2506a
- Amend And Recommit To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
+ − Votes (2)
January 29, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 11
February 27, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 11