+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 2504a
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.207
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.469
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
April 16, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 1
January 17, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19
May 10, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
March 21, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19