+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1274
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2500a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Vote
May 15, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor