+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.128
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 250a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On February 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.30
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (4)
February 3, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 3
January 14, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 11