+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to energy and telecommunications
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.27
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to energy and telecommunications
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Energy and Telecommunications - Feb 4, 2013
- Yeas: 11
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
February 4, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Energy and Telecommunications - Feb 4, 2013
- Yeas: 11
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Martin Malavé Dilan: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Joseph A. Griffo: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- Patty Ritchie: yea
- Joseph E. Robach: yea
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor