+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A3676a
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 2487a
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.633
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Vote
April 25, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 2