+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On July 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.281
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.393
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
July 21, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
January 27, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 12
June 3, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
April 8, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor