+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.47
- Signed Chap.701
On November 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.341
- Substituted For A4189
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On May 22, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On May 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1022
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2473a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 22
February 14, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor