+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2465c
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Higher Education
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2465b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Higher Education
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2465a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor