+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
- Amended 2455a
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.94
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1779
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Votes (3)
January 9, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 11
June 15, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 15, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor