+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 12, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On February 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.327
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On May 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.483
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (4)
February 12, 2024: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 5
February 5, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 15, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
March 13, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2