+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2433b
- Amend And Recommit To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2433a
- Amend And Recommit To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Vote
May 23, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor