+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2422b
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On May 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 2422a
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.271
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 1, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor